blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973030

EP0973030 - Control method for an oxygen linear sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.06.2009  [2009/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A.
Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63
Corbetta (MI) / IT
[2008/22]
Former [2008/19]For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A.
Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63
20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI S.p.A.
Via Griziotti 4
20145 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Poggio Luca
Via Genova,39
15047 Spinetta Marengo / IT
02 / Secco, Marco
Via Fabiani, 2
14049 Nizza Monferrato / IT
03 / Ceccarini, Daniele
Via Marchi, 46
47900 Rimini / IT
[2000/24]
Former [2000/03]01 / Poggio Luca
Via Genova,39
15047 Spinetta Marengo / IT
02 / Secco, Marco
Via Fabiani, 2
14049 Nizza Monferato / IT
03 / Ceccarini, Daniele
Via Marchi, 46
47900 Rimini / IT
Representative(s)Franzolin, Luigi, et al
Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Franzolin, Luigi, et al
STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date99113851.215.07.1999
[2000/03]
Priority number, dateIT1998BO0043516.07.1998         Original published format: IT BO980435
[2000/03]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973030
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973030
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01N27/417
[2000/03]
CPC:
G01N27/4175 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/40]
Former [2000/03]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode zur Steuerung eines linearen Sauerstoffsensors[2000/03]
English:Control method for an oxygen linear sensor[2000/03]
French:Méthode de contrôle d'un capteur d'oxygène linéaire[2000/03]
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/14]
22.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2008Fee for grant paid
15.05.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
23.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS58161859  ;
 [A]JPS58162858  ;
 [Y]US5524472  (HOETZEL GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US5558752  (WANG DA Y [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 25; figure 1 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 290, Database accession no. (P - 245), & JP58161859 A 00000000 (HITACHI) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830927), vol. 7, no. 290, Database accession no. (P - 245), & JP58162858 A 00000000 (HITACHI) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.