EP1063030 - Press device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UMIX Co., Ltd. 8-1, Shinke 1-chome Neyagawa-shi Osaka 572-0812 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Umix Co., Ltd. 8-1, Shinke 1-chome Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0812 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuo, Matsuoka 25-3, Korigaoka 8-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0084 / JP | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99113861.1 | 15.07.1999 | [2000/52] | Priority number, date | JP19990179235 | 25.06.1999 Original published format: JP 17923599 | [2000/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1063030 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1063030 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/32 | [2000/52] | CPC: |
B21D28/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/41] |
Former [2000/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pressvorrichtung | [2000/52] | English: | Press device | [2000/52] | French: | Dispositif de pressage | [2000/52] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 27.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 15.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0922509 (UMIX CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 7, lines 38-43 *; | [A]US5269167 (GERHART ROLAND T) [A] 1-5 * column 4, lines 13-52 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 14 * * figures 2,4,7-9 *; | [AD]US5101705 (MATSUOKA MITSUO) [AD] 1-5 * figure - * |