blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0974853

EP0974853 - Method for producing chirped in-fibre bragg grating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hoshino, Hiroyuki
1-17-2, Naka-Narusawacho Hitachi-shi
Ibaragi-Pref. 316-0033 / JP
[2006/37]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Hoshino, Hiroyuki
1-17-2, Naka-Narusawacho
Hitachi-shi, Ibaragi-Pref. 316-0033 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date99114094.820.07.1999
[2000/04]
Priority number, dateJP1998020459421.07.1998         Original published format: JP 20459498
JP1998000912018.11.1998         Original published format: JP 912098
JP1998033723627.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33723698
JP1999005390602.03.1999         Original published format: JP 5390699
[2000/44]
Former [2000/28]JP1998020459421.07.1998
JP1998033723627.11.1998
JP1999005390602.03.1999
Former [2000/04]JP1998020459421.07.1998
JP1998000912018.11.1998
JP1998033723627.11.1998
JP1999005390602.03.1999
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974853
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974853
Date:13.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/293
[2000/04]
CPC:
G02B6/02085 (EP,US); G02B6/02142 (EP,US); G02B6/02147 (EP,US);
G02B6/02152 (EP,US); G02B6/29317 (EP,US); G02B6/0229 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [2000/41]
Former [2000/04]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bragg-Gitters mit einer sich örtlich verändernden Periode in einer Faser[2005/48]
English:Method for producing chirped in-fibre bragg grating[2000/04]
French:Procédé pour fabriquer un réseau de Bragg à période variable dans une fibre optique[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bragg-Gitters mit einer sich örtlich verändernder Periode in einer Faser
Examination procedure13.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
01.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2006Fee for grant paid
03.07.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200507   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2005
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.09.2006
[2008/16]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9726570  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8 * page 5, line 21 - line 32 * * page 6 - page 9 * * page 10, line 1 - line 26 * * page 11, line 12 - line 31 * * page 12, line 1 - line 15 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]WO9807058  (CORNING INC [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * page 8, line 19 - line 35 * * page 9, line 1 - line 35 * * page 10, line 1 - line 32 * * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0843186  (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 46 - line 58 * * column 4 - column 5 * * column 6, line 1 - line 57 * * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.