EP0974294 - Strip shaped spring element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mankau, Dieter, Prof. Seumestrasse 11 60316 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Mankau, Dieter, Prof. Seumestr. 11 D-60316 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Alber, Norbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114349.6 | 21.07.1999 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | DE1998132689 | 21.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832689 | [2000/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0974294 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0974294 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0974294 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47C23/06 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
A47C23/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | Streifenförmiges Federelement | [2000/04] | English: | Strip shaped spring element | [2000/04] | French: | Elément de ressort en forme de bande | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.11.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | NL | 24.11.2004 | GR | 24.02.2005 | SE | 24.02.2005 | PT | 24.04.2005 | AT | 21.07.2005 | CY | 21.07.2005 | IT | 21.07.2005 | LU | 21.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/34] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
AT | 21.07.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
IT | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
AT | 21.07.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
LU | 21.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
AT | 21.07.2005 | ||
CY | 21.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
SE | 24.02.2005 | ||
AT | 21.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
AT | 21.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
NL | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 24.11.2004 | |
GR | 24.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 24.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4703526 (DEGEN HUGO [CH]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]US5388290 (SHIRAI KUNITO [JP]) [A] 1-24* the whole document * |