EP0999452 - Method and apparatus for automatically acquiring a waveform measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304-1181 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Felps, Jimmie D. 4862 Garden Pl. Colorado Springs, CO 80918 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114417.1 | 22.07.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | US19980184105 | 02.11.1998 Original published format: US 184105 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999452 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0999452 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/34 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
G01R13/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/04] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zum automatischen Aufnehmen einer Wellenform | [2006/04] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatically acquiring a waveform measurement | [2000/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour capter automatiquement une forme d'onde | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/19] | Verfahren und Apparat zum automatisches Aufnehmen einer Wellenform | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 12.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0349328 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0515028 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [X]US5375067 (BERCHIN GREGORY J [US]) [X] 1-10 * see abstract;; claim 1 * |