EP0977474 - Shielding of low frequency electromagnetic fields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/05] | Screening of low frequency electromagnetic fields | ||
[2004/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCT Steel Consulting Terni S.r.l. Via Cavour, 3 05100 Terni / IT | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gubiotti, Roberto Via Casagrande, 66 05100 Terni / IT | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/05] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl, Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99114474.2 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | IT1998RM00503 | 29.07.1998 Original published format: IT RM980503 | [2000/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0977474 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0977474 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0977474 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
H05K9/0003 (EP);
H01F1/14775 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | Abschirmung gegen elektromagnetisches Feld niedriger Frequenz | [2004/47] | English: | Shielding of low frequency electromagnetic fields | [2004/47] | French: | Blindage contre les champs électromagnétiques basses fréquences | [2000/05] |
Former [2000/05] | Abschirmung gegen elektromagnetischen Feld niedriger Frequenz | ||
Former [2000/05] | Screening of low frequency electromagnetic fields | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 28.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | ES | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | FR | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | CY | 23.07.2005 | LU | 23.07.2005 | IE | 25.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GB | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | DE | 02.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/45] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
ES | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 23.07.2005 | ||
LU | 23.07.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
FR | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
ES | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 23.07.2005 | ||
LU | 23.07.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
ES | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 23.07.2005 | ||
LU | 23.07.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
ES | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
CY | 23.07.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
ES | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 01.08.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GB | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
DE | 02.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 25.07.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0373598 ; | [A]JPH0354895 ; | [A]GB2225327 (KITAGAWA IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]US5045637 (SATO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 6 - line 33 *; | [XA]DE4205102 (WEYAND KURT DR ING [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-14 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910620), vol. 015, no. 240, Database accession no. (E - 1079), & JP03073598 A 19910328 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910522), vol. 015, no. 200, Database accession no. (E - 1070), & JP03054895 A 19910308 (BOUON KOGYO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |