EP0978929 - Method and apparatus for impregnating bar conductors for the stator winding of an electrical machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alstom 25, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [2002/27] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klee, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Ludwigsdorf 37 69483 Waldmichelbach / DE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2001/17] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/06] | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114486.6 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | DE1998135361 | 05.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19835361 | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0978929 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0978929 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978929 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/46] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Imprägnieren von Leiterstäben für die Statorwicklung einer elektrischen Maschine | [2000/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for impregnating bar conductors for the stator winding of an electrical machine | [2000/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'imprégnation de barres conductrices pour l'enroulement statorique d'une machine électrique | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/40] | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.10.2002 | GB | 02.10.2002 | IT | 02.10.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 02.10.2002 | |
GB | 02.10.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 02.10.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07231622 ; | [AP]JPH10295063 ; | [A]US4405553 (LOEVGREN GOERAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 37; figure 3 *; | [A]US5771563 (MEIER WALTER [CH], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 60; figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, & JP07231622 A 19950829 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990226), vol. 1999, no. 02, & JP10295063 A 19981104 (TOSHIBA CORP) [AP] 1-10 * abstract * |