EP0976644 - Frontal collision protection device for a commercial vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVECO FIAT S.p.A. Via Puglia 35 10156 Torino / IT | [2000/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riva, Vittorio Via Onorato Castellino, 11/1 10100 Torino / IT | [2000/05] | Representative(s) | Passini, Angelo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Passini, Angelo, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/42] | Passini, Angelo, et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.P.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/05] | Cerbaro, Elena, Dr., et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99114523.6 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/05] | Priority number, date | IT1998TO00655 | 28.07.1998 Original published format: IT TO980655 | [2000/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0976644 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0976644 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
B62D27/065 (EP);
B62D21/152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/05] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung bei Frontalaufprall für Lastkraftwagen | [2000/05] | English: | Frontal collision protection device for a commercial vehicle | [2000/05] | French: | Dispositif de protection de choc frontal pour camions | [2000/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.09.2003 | BE | 17.09.2003 | CY | 17.09.2003 | FI | 17.09.2003 | NL | 17.09.2003 | DK | 17.12.2003 | GR | 17.12.2003 | PT | 26.12.2003 | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/41] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
DK | 17.12.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
PT | 26.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
BE | 17.09.2003 | ||
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 17.09.2003 | |
FI | 17.09.2003 | ||
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
GR | 17.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 17.09.2003 | |
NL | 17.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 17.09.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3751093 (HEBERT V) [A] 1* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]US4358152 (MAYER GUSTAV, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 8; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3827923 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 38; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5727827 (SHIBUYA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 28 - line 34 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 8; figure - * |