EP0978731 - Rocket trajectory estimating method, rocket future-position predicting method, rocket identifying method, and rocket situation detecting method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2013/47] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muto, Eiichiro 8-1, Unuma-Yamazaki-cho 6-chome Kakamigahara-shi, Gifu-ken / JP | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/11] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/20] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/06] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl Grosse - Bockhorni & Partner, Forstenrieder Allee 59 81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114535.0 | 23.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | JP19980219388 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: JP 21938898 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978731 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978731 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/72 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
G01S13/723 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/43] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Raketenbahnabschätzung, Verfahren zur Raketenzukunftstandortvorhersage, Verfahren zur Raketenidentifizierung, und Verfahren zur Raketenlagenerkennung | [2000/06] | English: | Rocket trajectory estimating method, rocket future-position predicting method, rocket identifying method, and rocket situation detecting method | [2000/06] | French: | Procédé pour l'estimation de la trajectoire d'une fusée, procédé pour la prédiction de la position future d'une fusée, procédé pour l'identification d'une fusée, et procédé pour la détection de la situation d'une fusée | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 10.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2005 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5525995 (BENNER ROBERT H [US]) [A] 1,3,6-8 * column A * * column 2, line 49 - column 10, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [XA] - HUYNH HUU THANH, "Adaptive linear filtering in the presence of an evolution noise of poorly known variance", RECHERCHE AEROSPATIALE, JAN.-FEB. 1979, FRANCE, no. 2, ISSN 0034-1223, pages 11 - 22, XP002120086 [X] 1 * abstract * * page 12, column L, line 48 - page 16, column L, line 46; figure 1 * [A] 3,6-8 | [PXA] - SOU-CHEN LEE ET AL, "Improved trajectory estimation of reentry vehicles from radar measurements using on-line adaptive input estimator", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON FUNDAMENTALS OF ELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, SEPT. 1998, INST. ELECTRON. INF. & COMMUN. ENG, JAPAN, vol. E81-A, no. 9, ISSN 0916-8508, pages 1867 - 1876, XP002120087 [PX] 1 * abstract * * page 1867, column L, line 20 - page 1871, column R, line 10; figures 1,2 * [PA] 3,6-8 |