EP0979747 - Replenishment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Knut, Dr. Am Lünink 55 45239 Essen / DE | 02 /
Löw, Peter Andreas An der Zentlinde 20 64711 Erbach / DE | 03 /
Zapp, Thomas, Dr. Sauerländer Strasse 17 44265 Dortmund / DE | 04 /
Kochsmeier, Christian Grosse Heihmstrasse 52 44137 Dortmund / DE | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2000/07] | Rassler, Andrea, Dipl.-Phys. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114570.7 | 24.07.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | DE19981036057 | 10.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19836057 | [2000/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0979747 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0979747 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979747 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/077, B60K15/04 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
B60K15/077 (EP,US);
B67D99/00 (KR);
B60K15/04 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03467 (EP,US);
Y10T137/469 (EP,US);
Y10T137/479 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/39] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befülleinrichtung | [2000/07] | English: | Replenishment device | [2000/07] | French: | Dispositif de remplissage | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 29.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.2004
ADMISSIBLE DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestr. 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/06] | 14.01.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.07.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.05.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 10.12.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2008/07] | Appeal following opposition | 29.06.2006 | Appeal received No. T1007/06 | 30.08.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.12.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.02.2007 | GB | 24.07.2007 | FR | 31.07.2007 | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/26] | DE | 01.02.2007 | |
GB | 24.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | DE | 01.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2719583 (MALICK EMIL A) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]DE2452248 (FORD WERKE AG) [Y] 3-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0832777 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |