EP0982815 - Low crosstalk modular communication connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANDUIT CORPORATION 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park Illinois 60477-3091 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states PANDUIT CORPORATION 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park Illinois 60477-3091 / US | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Panduit Corporation 17301 Ridgeland Avenue Tinley Park, Illinois 60477-3091 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stroede, Andrew J. 11631 194th Street Mokena, Illinois 60448 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Vogeser, Werner, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Vogeser, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114851.1 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980138969 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: US 138969 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982815 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982815 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982815 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H01R13/6466 (EP,US);
H01R13/6469 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R24/64 (EP,US);
H01R9/031 (EP,US);
Y10S439/941 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/11] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modularer elektrischer Steckverbinder mit verringertem Übersprechen | [2000/09] | English: | Low crosstalk modular communication connector | [2000/09] | French: | Connecteur modulaire avec interférences réduites | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05020963.4 / EP1622234 | EP08151330.1 / EP1923968 | EP08151331.9 / EP1923969 | EP08151332.7 / EP1923970 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/36] | Request for further processing for: | 08.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 08.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0603667 (PANDUIT CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 3 - column 15, line 36; figure 6 *; | [X]DE29804543U (HSING CHAU IND CO [TW]) [X] 6 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 30 *; | [A]US5766027 (FOGG MICHAEL W [US]) [A] 16 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 2 *; | [A]US5454738 (LIM GUNSANG [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * claims 9,10 *; | [A]EP0782221 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * column 8, line 37 - column 23, line 5 * |