EP0980723 - Apparatus and method for producing and handling coils of metal strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danieli United, A division of Danieli Corporation 400 Holiday Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15220-2727 / US | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL ROLLING MILL CONSULTANTS, INC. 612, Driftwood Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15238 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states Danieli United, A division of Danieli Corporation 400 Holiday Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15220-2727 / US | ||
For all designated states INTERNATIONAL ROLLING MILL CONSULTANTS, INC. 612, Driftwood Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15238 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ginzburg, Vladimir B. 612 Driftwood Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US | [2000/08] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114859.4 | 29.07.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | US19980134791 | 14.08.1998 Original published format: US 134791 | [2000/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980723 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0980723 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/02, B21C47/24 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
B21C47/24 (EP,US);
B21B1/463 (EP,US);
B21C47/04 (EP,US);
B21C47/245 (EP,US);
B21B1/26 (EP,US);
B21B2015/0057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Formen und Handhaben von Bunden aus Metallbändern | [2000/08] | English: | Apparatus and method for producing and handling coils of metal strip | [2000/08] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de formage et manutention de bobines de bandes métalliques | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/40] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04361826 ; | [A]DE2558964 (INNOCENTI SANTEUSTACCHIO SPA) [A] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0286082 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DA] 5,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5335713 (HOPPMANN HANS-DIETER [DE], et al) [DA] 5* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930512), vol. 017, no. 233, Database accession no. (M - 1407), & JP04361826 A 19921215 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US2430075 | US2734405 | US3032289 | US4152919 | US4271959 |