EP0979916 - Door stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tox-Dübel-Werk R.W. Heckhausen GmbH & Co. KG Überlinger Strasse 11 D-78351 Bodman-Ludwigshafen / DE | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leible, Dieter Im Winkel 9 78234 Engen-Bittelbrunn / DE | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Koch, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Wallach, Koch, Dr.Haibach, Feldkamp Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Koch, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99114991.5 | 31.07.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | DE1998136340 | 11.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19836340 | [2000/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0979916 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/54 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
E05C17/00 (EP);
E05C17/52 (EP);
E05F5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | Türstopper | [2000/07] | English: | Door stop | [2000/07] | French: | Arrêt de porte | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/15] | 31.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2001/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8715825U (DETHLOFF, GERHARD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5547238 (PAYETTE RICHARD) [A] 1-11 * column W *; | [A]US1958807 (GUSTAVUS W. THOMPSON) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2079088 (PFISTERER ERWIN) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |