blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0978258

EP0978258 - Instrument for the positioning of an implant in the human spine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stryker Trauma GmbH
Prof.-Küntscher-Str.1-5
24232 Schönkirchen / DE
[2002/42]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Howmedica GmbH
Professor-Küntscher-Str. 1-5
D-24232 Schönkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Robioneck, Bernd
Rastorfer Strasse 13
24211 Preetz / DE
02 / Lutz, Christian
153 bis route d'Arcachon
F-33610 Cestas Pierroton / FR
03 / Windhager, Rainhard, Prof. Dr.
Bodinskygasse 9/19
1190 Vienna / AT
04 / Kotz, Rainer, Prof.
Wipplinger Strasse 21/21
1010 Vienna / AT
05 / Vlasak, Richard, Dr.
University of Florida, PO Box 100 246
Gainsville, Florida 32610-0246 / US
06 / Wuisman, Paul, Prof.
Dept. of Orthopaedics, University Hospital
De Boelelaan 1117, 1007 Amsterdam / NL
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/06]Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons
Neuer Wall 41
20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99115017.802.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE1998214174U07.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29814174 U
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978258
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978258
Date:16.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/58, A61B17/02, A61F2/44, A61F2/46
[2000/06]
CPC:
A61F2/4611 (EP,US); A61B17/025 (EP,US); A61F2/44 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (EP,US); A61B17/7059 (EP,US); A61B17/809 (EP,US);
A61B17/86 (EP,US); A61F2002/30125 (EP,US); A61F2002/30131 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30228 (EP,US); A61F2002/30235 (EP,US); A61F2002/30237 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30329 (EP,US); A61F2002/30383 (EP,US); A61F2002/30387 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30428 (EP,US); A61F2002/30494 (EP,US); A61F2002/30507 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30517 (EP,US); A61F2002/3055 (EP,US); A61F2002/30553 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30578 (EP,US); A61F2002/30593 (EP,US); A61F2002/30599 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30601 (EP,US); A61F2002/30604 (EP,US); A61F2002/30774 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30777 (EP,US); A61F2002/30785 (EP,US); A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US); A61F2002/30975 (EP,US); A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US); A61F2230/0013 (EP,US); A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0008 (EP,US); A61F2250/0063 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Instrument zum Einsetzen eines Wirbelimplantats[2000/06]
English:Instrument for the positioning of an implant in the human spine[2000/06]
French:Instrument de mise en place d'un implant rachidien[2000/06]
Examination procedure23.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
04.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2002Fee for grant paid
06.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.10.2002
BE16.10.2002
FI16.10.2002
GR16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
DK16.01.2003
PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
[2007/18]
Former [2003/51]AT16.10.2002
BE16.10.2002
FI16.10.2002
GR16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
Former [2003/43]AT16.10.2002
FI16.10.2002
GR16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
Former [2003/37]AT16.10.2002
GR16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
Former [2003/31]GR16.10.2002
NL16.10.2002
PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
Former [2003/30]NL16.10.2002
PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
Former [2003/29]PT16.01.2003
SE16.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE16.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]US5776197  (RABBE LOUIS-MARIE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 7 - line 20 ** column 7, line 31 - line 42 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.