EP0978484 - Method and apparatus for making glass and particularly ceramic frits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA S.c.r.l. Via Provinciale Selice, 17/A 40026 Imola (BO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states SACMI COOPERATIVA MECCANICI IMOLA S.c.r.l. Via Selice Provinciale, 17/A 40026 Imola (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bresciani, Andrea Via Testi 9 48018 Faenza (Ravenna) / IT | 02 /
Acerbi, Pierugo Via Fratelli Gualandi 8 40026 Imola (Bologna) / IT | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99115020.2 | 02.08.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | IT1998BO00489 | 06.08.1998 Original published format: IT BO980489 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978484 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978484 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03B3/00, C03B5/00, C03B19/10, C03C1/02 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
C03B19/095 (EP,US);
C03B5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Glas und insbesondere keramischen Fritten | [2000/06] | English: | Method and apparatus for making glass and particularly ceramic frits | [2000/06] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la production de verre et notamment de frittes céramiques | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.05.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.07.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Request for further processing for: | 05.05.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 05.05.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request procedure closed | 02.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.2004 | BE | 27.10.2004 | CH | 27.10.2004 | FI | 27.10.2004 | LI | 27.10.2004 | NL | 27.10.2004 | DK | 27.01.2005 | GR | 27.01.2005 | SE | 27.01.2005 | PT | 27.03.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
SE | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
NL | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
BE | 27.10.2004 | ||
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
DK | 27.01.2005 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 27.10.2004 | |
CH | 27.10.2004 | ||
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
GR | 27.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 27.10.2004 | |
FI | 27.10.2004 | ||
LI | 27.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 27.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DD94237 (THEUNER) [X] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4 *; | [A]US3798018 (PARIDON L, et al) [A] 1-12 * column W *; | [X]DD112638 (NÖLLE) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DD122620 (NÖLLE) [X] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 6, paragraph 3; example - *; | [A]DE3726832 (SORG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-12* column W * |