blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980702

EP0980702 - A method of treating exhaust gas and an apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsumura, Hiroshi
Advanced Functional Materials Research Center
2-13-1 Isobe, Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Kawaguchi, Sakae c/o Naoetsu Plant
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co.,Ltd, 28-1 Oaza Nishi-Fukushima
Kubiki-mura, Naka Kubiki-gun, Niigata / JP
03 / Teshigawara, Seiichi
Gunma Complex, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-13-1 Isobe, Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
04 / Hirasawa, Hideo
Advanced Functional Materials Research Center
2-13-1 Isobe, Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115048.304.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998024110411.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24110498
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980702
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:B01D53/68
[2000/08]
CPC:
B01D53/68 (EP); B01D15/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Abgasen[2000/08]
English:A method of treating exhaust gas and an apparatus therefor[2000/08]
French:Procédé et installation pour le traitement des gaz d'échappement[2000/08]
Examination procedure07.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/20]
10.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3789109  (LYON R, et al) [X] 5,6 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 26 * * column 8, line 28 - line 68; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 1-4;
 [Y]EP0022172  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 15; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4304193  (NOELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3582262  (TOMANY JAMES P) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.