blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980028

EP0980028 - Erasable image forming material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/48]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takayama, Satoshi
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
02 / Machida, Shigeru
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
03 / Sano, Kenji
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
04 / Tsunemi, Koichi
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
05 / Sato, Shuitsu
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
06 / Ikeda, Naru
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
07 / Urano, Taeko
c/o Intellectual Property Division, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
 [2007/27]
Former [2000/07]01 / Takayama, Satoshi
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
02 / Machida, Shigeru
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
03 / Sano, Kenji
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
04 / Tsunemi, Koichi
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
05 / Sato, Shuitsu
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
06 / Ikeda, Naru
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
07 / Urano, Taeko
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div.
1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115057.404.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022046804.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22046898
JP1998022050104.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22050198
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980028
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980028
Date:28.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:G03G9/09, C09D11/00, B41M5/128, B41M7/00
[2000/07]
CPC:
C09D11/50 (EP,US); B41M5/128 (EP,US); B41M7/0009 (EP,US);
G03G9/0928 (EP,US); B41M5/132 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Löschbares bildformendes Material[2000/07]
English:Erasable image forming material[2000/07]
French:Matériau de formation d' images effacable[2000/07]
Examination procedure04.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
18.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2007Fee for grant paid
10.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH1088046  ;
 [PX]US5922115  (SANO KENJI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-8 * examples 1-13; claims 1-6 *;
 [X]US5527385  (SUMII MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,13,18 * examples 21-25; claim 12 *;
 [A]JPS6214163  ;
 [A]JPH0414482  ;
 [A]JPH0781236  ;
 [A]US4028118  (NAKASUJI NORIKAZU, et al) [A] 9,16,17 * column 10, line 25 - column 16, line 60; claims 1-9 *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 24, Database accession no. 1998-267331, XP002123730 & JPH1088046 A 19980407 (TOSHIBA) [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1987, no. 09, Database accession no. 1987-060158, XP002123731 & JPS6214163 A 00000000 (FUJI XEROX) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920423), vol. 16, no. 169, Database accession no. (M - 1239), & JP04014482 A 19920120 (KAO) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 1995, no. 6, & JP07081236 A 19950328 (RICOH) [A] 1 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.