blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979880

EP0979880 - Non-chromium metal pretreatment chemicals and process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.07.2003  [2003/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Paint Co., Ltd.
1-2, Oyodokita 2-chome Oyodo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
NIPPON PAINT CO., LTD.
1-2, Oyodokita 2-chome Oyodo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimakura, Toshiaki
3-8-6 Kitakata
Ichikawa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
02 / Wada, Yutaka
2-16-22 Haze-cho
Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
03 / Fukuoka, Takayuki
15-1-509 Kitaoohi-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115165.513.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022891113.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22891198
JP1999019451408.07.1999         Original published format: JP 19451499
JP1999020901223.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20901299
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979880
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:C23C22/60, C23C22/08, C23C22/53, C23C22/23, C23C22/10, C23C22/50, C23C22/56, C23C22/62, C23C22/66
[2000/07]
CPC:
C23C22/66 (EP,US); C23C22/30 (KR); C23C22/08 (EP,US);
C23C22/10 (EP,US); C23C22/23 (EP,US); C23C22/50 (EP,US);
C23C22/53 (EP,US); C23C22/56 (EP,US); C23C22/60 (EP,US);
C23C22/62 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Chemikalien und Verfahren zur Metallvorbehandlung ohne Chrom[2000/07]
English:Non-chromium metal pretreatment chemicals and process[2000/07]
French:Substances chimiques et procédé pour le prétraitement sans chrome de métaux[2002/39]
Former [2000/07]Substances chimiques et procédé pour le prétraitement de métaux
Examination procedure13.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
07.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/29]
14.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0853105  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 5, line 4; claims 1-3,6-20 *;
 [X]GB2032963  (DART IND INC) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 13; example 22 *;
 [X]US4298405  (SAUS J ARTHUR, et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,12-14 * column 1, lines 20,21; claims 1,4,6,7 *;
 [X]WO9111542  (HENKEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,8-14 * page 13, line 35; example K8; claims 1,7 *;
 [X]US4331487  (MIRRA MICHAEL J, et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,12-14 * column 4, lines 10-62 *;
 [X]FR1065191  (CIE D APPLIC CHIMIQUES A L IND) [X] 1-3,5,8,9,12,13 * column 1, lines 7,8; example 2 *;
 [X]US2762733  (PETER BORGHETTI, et al) [X] 1-5,12-14 * column 3, lines 56-75; examples 2,6; claim 1 *;
 [X]US3922389  (TOLEDO EMIL, et al) [X] 1-6,12,14 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 29 *;
 [X]EP0363200  (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,12-14 * table 1 *;
 [X]DE1911972  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [X] 1-5,12-14 * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2272192  (PARKER STE CONTINENTALE [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,12-14 * examples 1,2 *;
 [X]JPH10183366  ;
 [X]JPS6360288  ;
 [X]JPS55141575  ;
 [A]EP0760401  (DIPSOL CHEM [JP]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, columns 10-43; example 11; claims 1,2,5,13 * * page 3, lines 15-19 *;
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10183366 A 19980714 (NIPPON PARKERIZING CO LTD;TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-5,12-14 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880803), vol. 012, no. 283, Database accession no. (C - 518), & JP63060288 A 19880316 (SANKO KAGAKU KK;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-4,12,14 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810130), vol. 005, no. 016, Database accession no. (C - 041), & JP55141575 A 19801105 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - KEPING H ET AL, "A PROTECTIVE COATING OF SILICATE ON ZINCPLATE", MATERIALS AND CORROSION - WERKSTOFFE UND KORROSION,DE,VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, WEINHEIM, vol. 48, no. 2, ISSN 0947-5117, page 110-112, XP000655404 [A] 1,8,9,12,13 * page 110, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/maco.19970480206
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.