EP0978441 - Steering angle middle point detecting device and power steering apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2007/11] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaji, Hiroaki, c/o JTEKT Corporation No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 02 /
Sakamaki, Masahiko, c/o JTEKT Corporation No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [2007/04] |
Former [2000/06] | 01 /
Kaji, Hiroaki, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakamaki, Masahiko, c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd. No. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115214.1 | 31.07.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | JP19980219447 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: JP 21944798 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0978441 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0978441 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978441 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D15/02 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
B62D15/02 (EP,US);
B62D5/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/32] |
Former [2000/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Ermittlung des Mittelpunktes des Lenkungswinkels und Servolenkung | [2000/06] | English: | Steering angle middle point detecting device and power steering apparatus | [2000/06] | French: | Dispositif détecteur du point milieu de l'angle de rotation du volant et direction assistée | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS62231874 ; | [A]EP0350819 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure 13; claim 2 *; | [A]EP0546789 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claims 14,15,17,19-21 *; | [PA]EP0900711 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [PA] 1-10* figure 2; claims 3,4 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880331), vol. 012, no. 098, Database accession no. (M - 680), & JP62231874 A 19871012 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH02197465 | JPH0643188 | JPH08198129 |