Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000053011 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21944798 | 03.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0978441 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2007 | B1 | EP0978441 | 20.11.2002 | A3 | EP0978441 | 09.02.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP21944798 | 03.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9903427 | 19.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21944798 | 03.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69935475T | 29.11.2007 | T2 | DE69935475D1 | 26.04.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP21944798 | 03.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6131059 | 10.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP21944798 | 03.08.1998 |