blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980777

EP0980777 - Multi-part sliding screen for sliding roof arrangement for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  30.07.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.09.2004  [2004/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Minatti, Johann
Irisstrasse 31
80935 München / DE
02 / Schuster, Gerd, Dr.
St.-Margarethen-Strasse 20
85764 Oberschleissheim / DE
[2000/08]
Application number, filing date99115345.303.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateDE199813750319.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837503
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980777
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980777
Date:20.12.2000
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2000
ClassificationIPC:B60J7/00
[2000/08]
CPC:
B60J7/0038 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/36]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mehrteiliger Schiebehimmel für ein Schiebedachsystem eines Personenkraftwagens[2000/08]
English:Multi-part sliding screen for sliding roof arrangement for motor vehicles[2000/08]
French:Store coulissant en parties multiples pour système de toit coulissant pour véhicule automobile[2000/08]
Examination procedure16.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/12]
05.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/38]
24.04.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
09.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3904486  (GABEL) [X] 1 * column W *;
 [Y]US4852938  (HIRSHBERG GERALD P [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 57; figures 1-9 *;
 [Y]DE3644493  (WEBASTO WERK BAIER KG W [DE]) [Y] 1,2,5 * column W *;
 [YA]FR2718485  (HEULIEZ WEBASTO [FR]) [Y] 4 * figure 4 * [A] 1
by applicantDE4111931
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.