17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.10.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
18.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] |
26.10.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
03.11.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
21.10.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
20.10.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
25.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.08.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.06.2000 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
30.06.2000 |
Change - German title |
published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] |
27.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.05.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.05.2000 |
Change - German title |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
29.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
04.02.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] |
04.02.2000 |
First examination report |
|
20.01.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.01.2000 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
25.10.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.09.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
27.08.1999 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|