EP0987694 - Optical data recording apparatus, and data recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/12] | Optical data recording method, and data recording medium | ||
[2000/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shoji, Mamoru 3-13-4-805, Mozuumemachi Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8035 / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Takashi 13-14, Hashimotoisoku Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8331 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Atsushi Shokoryo, 25-3, Midocho Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0064 / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115620.9 | 06.07.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980259908 | 14.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25990898 | JP19980350100 | 09.12.1998 Original published format: JP 35010098 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987694 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987694 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, G11B20/10, G11B7/00 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G11B7/00456 (EP,KR,US);
G11B20/10194 (EP,US);
G11B20/10212 (EP,US);
G11B7/0045 (EP,US);
G11B7/00454 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/005 (KR);
G11B7/0062 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (EP,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/0079 (KR);
G11B7/126 (EP,US);
G11B7/261 (EP,US);
G11B20/1217 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1265 (KR);
G11B2220/2537 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/49] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Datenaufzeichnungsgerät und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium | [2000/26] | English: | Optical data recording apparatus, and data recording medium | [2000/26] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement optique de données, et support d'enregistrement de données | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/12] | Optisches Datenaufzeichnungsverfahren und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium | ||
Former [2000/12] | Optical data recording method, and data recording medium | ||
Former [2000/12] | Procédé d'enregistrement optique de données, et support d'enregistrement de données | Examination procedure | 07.08.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 30.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 25.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.01.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99113060.0 / EP0987692 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2002/10] | FR | 18.05.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0477892 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,14,15 * column 4, line 7 - line 45 * * column 21, line 10 - column 22, line 6; figures 1,2,20 * [A] 5-13; | [YA]US5636194 (FURUMIYA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 5-13; | [A]EP0552936 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0749114 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,14 * abstract * | Examination | EP0978827 |