EP0978236 - The use of cholesterol-synthesis inhibitors for the reduction of the level of cholesterol in bird eggs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2008/31] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Klaus, Dr. Daniel-Knobloch-Strasse 4 76829 Landau / DE | 02 /
Baldenius, Kai-Uwe, Dr. Hannongstrasse 6 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 03 /
Hoppe, Peter Paul, Dr.med.vet. Am Hauenstein 13 67157 Wachenheim / DE | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115698.5 | 09.08.1999 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | DE1998135850 | 07.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19835850 | [2000/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978236 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/16, A61K31/05 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A23K20/105 (EP,US);
A23K20/174 (EP,US);
A23K50/75 (EP,US);
A61K31/045 (EP,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/06] | Extension states | RO | 28.07.2000 | SI | 28.07.2000 | Title | German: | Verwendung von Hemmstoffen der Cholesterin-Biosynthese zur Senkung des Cholesteringehaltes in Geflügelei | [2000/06] | English: | The use of cholesterol-synthesis inhibitors for the reduction of the level of cholesterol in bird eggs | [2000/06] | French: | Utilisation d'inhibiteurs de la biosynthèse du cholestérol pour diminuer la teneur en cholestérol des oeufs de volaille | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 03.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4603142 (BURGER WARREN C [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 1 * * tables 1-4 * * claims 3,4 *; | [XY]EP0543417 (LIPOGENICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * page 6, line 29 - line 39 * * page 7, line 22 - line 25 * * page 8, line 50 - line 56 * * page 10, line 40 - line 42 * * page 14, line 22 - line 27 * * examples 8,12 * * claims 2,4,25,26,33 * [Y] 1,2,4-7; | [DX]US5217992 (WRIGHT JOHN J [US], et al) [DX] 11 * example 7; table 5 * * claims 1-6 *; | [XA]US5296508 (PEARCE BRADLEY C [US]) [X] 11 * column 2, line 22 - line 25 * * column 2, line 51 - line 56 * * column 4, line 1 * * tables 1,6 * [A] 4,7; | [Y] - ELSON, C.E., "Novel Lipids and Cancer, Isoprenoids and Other Phytochemicals", DIETARY FATS, LIPIDS, HORMONES, AND TUMORGENESIS, NEW YORK US, (1996), pages 71 - 86, XP002067388 [Y] 1,2,4-7 * page 71 - page 72; figure 1 * | [X] - HOOD, R.L. ET AL., "The Effect of Dietary Monoterpenes on the Cholesterol Level of Eggs", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (1978), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 304 - 306, XP000856191 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,11 * the whole document * | [XA] - YU, S.G., ET AL., "Dietary beta-Ionone Suppresses Hepatic 3-Hydroxy-3-methylglutaryl Coenzyme A Reductase Activity", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (1994), vol. 42, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1493 - 1496, XP002122914 [X] 11 * page 1494; table 1 * * page 1495; table 3 * [A] 4,5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00043a019 | [XA] - BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, XP002122917 [X] 11 * abstract * [A] 4,7 | [ ] - PEARCE, B.C., ET AL., "Inhibitors of cholesterol biosynthesis.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (1994), vol. 37, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00030a012, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 526 - 541, XP002120203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00030a012 | [X] - FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, XP002122918 [X] 11 * abstract * | [ ] - QURESHI, A.A. ET AL., "Effects of brewers grain and other cereals on lipid metabolism in chickens.", NUTRITION RESEARCH., XX, XX, (1991), vol. 11, no. 2/3, ISSN 0271-5317, pages 159 - 168 | [A] - FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, XP002122919 [A] 7 * abstract * | [ ] - SUGIYAMA, K. ET AL., "Isolation of plasma cholesterol-lowering components from ningyotake (Polyporus confluens) mushroom.", JOURNAL OF NUTRITIONAL SCIENCE AND VITAMINOLOGY., ISSN: 0301-4800, (1992), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 335 - 342 |