EP0980897 - Pigment preparation for offset printing with improved rheological properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metz, Hans Joachim, Dr. Jahnstrasse 36 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Weide, Joachim Im Stückes 63 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 03 /
Wallach, Thomas, Dr. Kirschbaumweg 7 65597 Hünfelden / DE | [2000/08] | Application number, filing date | 99115744.7 | 10.08.1999 | [2000/08] | Priority number, date | DE1998137302 | 18.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837302 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980897 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0980897 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980897 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/08, C09D11/02, C09B67/20 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09B67/006 (KR);
C09B67/001 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/08] | C09B67/08, C09D11/02 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2002/10] |
Former [2000/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Pigmentpräparation für den Offsetdruck mit verbesserten rheologischen Eigenschaften | [2000/08] | English: | Pigment preparation for offset printing with improved rheological properties | [2000/08] | French: | Préparation pigmentaire pour l'impression offset ayant des propriétés rhéologiques améliorées | [2000/08] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2150216 (REICHHOLD ALBERT CHEMIE AG) [A] 1-3,5-12 * examples 2A,2B *; | [A]DE4114863 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,11,12* page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 12; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0548506 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5-12 * example 5; claim - *; | [A]EP0725096 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,11,12 * column 1, line 37 - column 3, line 31; example 3 *; | [A]EP0733685 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 18 * * example 5 *; | [X]EP0768349 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,12 * column 10, line 25 - line 50 *; | [X]EP0769538 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11,12 * column 12, line 11 - line 40 * * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 40 *; | [A]EP0773233 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,8-12 * example 11; claims 1-5,9 *; | [A]EP0816392 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,11,12 * example 7; claim 12 * * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 42 * * column 7, line 14 - line 28 *; | [A]EP0816389 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-7,11,12 * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 3 * * Anwendungstechnisches Beispiel 2 * |