EP0984486 - Combined preanneal/oxidation step using rapid thermal processing (RTP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2004/26] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tews, Helmut Horst 26 Millbank Road Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | 02 /
Schrems, Martin Bruhmstrasse 4E/15 01465 Langebrück / DE | 03 /
Gärtner, Thomas Lindenweg 11 01458 Ottendorf-Okrilla / DE | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99115879.1 | 12.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | US19980146870 | 03.09.1998 Original published format: US 146870 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984486 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984486 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/316, H01L21/322 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
H01L21/324 (KR);
H01L21/02238 (EP,US);
H01L21/02255 (EP,US);
H01L21/31662 (US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | H01L21/316 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2001/01] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kombinierter Preanneal/Oxidationsschritt unter Verwendung eines schnellen thermischen Prozesses (RTP) | [2000/10] | English: | Combined preanneal/oxidation step using rapid thermal processing (RTP) | [2000/10] | French: | Etape de prérecuit/oxidation combinée utilisant un traitement thermique rapide (RTP) | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, PT, SE | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) LI | 17.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2008 | 27.10.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/13] | 13.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 12.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0214421 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4* column 3, line 8 *; | [DX]US5401669 (FALSTER ROBERT [IT], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-10 * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 13; example 6 *; | [X]US5502010 (NADAHARA SOUICHI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10 * column 3, lines 31-36 * * column 7, lines 45-49 *; | [DX]US5674756 (SATOH YUHKI [JP], et al) [DX] 1,2,4-9 * column 4, lines 40-44 * |