blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0981196

EP0981196 - A power supply for a vibrating compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAWAFUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
15-14 Toyotamakita 6-chome Nerima-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
SAWAFUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
15-14 Toyotamakita 6-chome
Nerima-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Namai, Masao, C/O Sawafuji Electric Co., Ltd.
No. 3 Aza Hayakawa, Ohaza Hayakawa, Nitta-machi
Nitta-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Akazawa, Naoki, C/O Sawafuji Electric Co., Ltd.
No. 3 Aza Hayakawa, Ohaza Hayakawa, Nitta-machi
Nitta-gun, Gunma-ken / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Reichel, Wolfgang, et al
2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Reichel, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Reichel und Reichel Parkstrasse 13
60322 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99116015.114.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998023131118.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23131198
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0981196
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
ClassificationIPC:H02M1/10, H02M3/337, F04B35/04
[2003/31]
CPC:
H02M1/10 (EP); H02M7/53803 (EP); H02P25/032 (EP);
H02M1/007 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/08]H02M1/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Stromversorgung für vibrierende Kompressoren[2000/08]
English:A power supply for a vibrating compressor[2000/08]
French:Alimentation de puissance pour compresseur vibrant[2000/08]
Examination procedure01.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
09.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.