EP0982038 - Stable powdery vitamin and carotenoide containing compositions and process to prepare them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N-Zyme BioTec GmbH Riedstrasse 7 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2003/33] |
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states N-Zyme BioTec GmbH c/o TU Darmstadt, Petersenstrasse 22 64287 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bewert, Wolfgang, Dr. Lorscher Ring 8c 67227 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Betz, Roland, Dr. Im Brühl 5 67150 Niederkirchen / DE | 03 /
Lüddecke, Erik, Dr. Thomas-Mann-Strasse 27 67112 Mutterstadt / DE | 04 /
Friedrich, Thomas, Dr. Saalbaustrasse 22-24 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116089.6 | 17.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | DE1998138189 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19838189 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0982038 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982038 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K9/16, A23J3/00, A23L1/302, A23L1/303, A23L1/305, A23K1/16 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/1658 (EP);
A23K20/174 (EP);
A23K20/179 (EP);
A23L33/15 (EP);
A23L33/155 (EP);
A61K9/1652 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/5432, A23V2250/60, A23V2250/5118, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/30, A23V2250/1628 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/224, A23V2250/5432, A23V2250/60, A23V2250/5118, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/30, A23V2250/51, A23V2250/1628 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/30, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/5432, A23V2250/211, A23V2250/708 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/606 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2003/01] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | RO | 28.01.2000 | SI | 28.01.2000 | Title | German: | Stabile pulverförmige Vitamin- und Carotinoid-Zubereitungen und Vefahren zu deren Herstellung | [2000/09] | English: | Stable powdery vitamin and carotenoide containing compositions and process to prepare them | [2000/09] | French: | Préparations pulvérulentes à la vitamin et le caroténoides et procédé de préparation | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
07.12.2006
WITHDRAWN DSM NUTRITIONAL PRODUCTS AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH Opponent's representative Pressner, Dietmar, et al, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
07.12.2006
WITHDRAWN DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH Opponent's representative Pressner, Dietmar, et al, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd. Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2007/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
25.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH Opponent's representative Pressner, Dietmar, et al, et al DSM Nutritional Products Ltd. Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2003/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.09.2003
25.09.2003
ADMISSIBLE Roche Vitamins AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | 14.11.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.03.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2006 | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 17.02.2007 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.01.2003 | GR | 08.01.2003 | IT | 08.01.2003 | DK | 08.04.2003 | PT | 08.04.2003 | SE | 08.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/05] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
DK | 08.04.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2003 | ||
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
PT | 08.04.2003 | ||
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 08.01.2003 | |
SE | 08.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 08.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0698743 ; | [A]JPS5828234 ; | [DA]US4670247 (SCIALPI LEONARD J [US]) [DA] 1,9; | [A]FR2659352 (NIPPI GELATINE IND LTD [JP], et al)[A] 1,9; | [A]EP0618001 (RHONE POULENC NUTRITION ANIMAL [FR]) [A] 1,9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940711), vol. 018, no. 367, Database accession no. (C - 1223), & JP06098743 A 19940412 (NIPPI ZERACHIN KOGYO KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830428), vol. 007, no. 100, Database accession no. (C - 164), & JP58028234 A 19830219 (YUKIJIRUSHI NIYUUGIYOU KK) [A] * abstract * |