EP0987221 - Method of purification of salt solutions for electrolysis by removing iodine- and/or silicate anions by anion exchange, using zirconium hydroxide as anion exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/12] | Method of purification of salt solutions for electrolysis | ||
[2006/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHLORINE ENGINEERS CORP., Ltd. Tomiokabashi Bldg. 6-11 Fukagawa 2-chome Koto-Ku Tokyo 135-0033 / JP | [2006/49] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states CHLORINE ENGINEERS CORP., Ltd. Tomioka-bashi Bldg., 6-11 Fukagawa 2-chome, Koto-Ku Tokyo 135-0033 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oohara. Chisako 202 New City Park Side, 1718, Chayamachi Kurashiki-city, Okayama 709-1121 / JP | 02 /
Matsuoka, Terumi 19-15, Chikko-Hiraki-machi Okayama-city, Okayama 702-805 / JP | 03 /
Kishi, Takamichi 3-4-6, Aoe Okayama-city, Okayama 700-0941 / JP | 04 /
Okuno, Takako 4-16-2, Kitayoshizu-cho Fukuyama-city, Hiroshima 720-0073 / JP | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116182.9 | 24.08.1999 | [2000/12] | Priority number, date | JP19980259426 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: JP 25942698 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0987221 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0987221 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01D3/16, C01D3/14 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
C01D3/16 (EP);
C01D3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2000/49] |
Former [2000/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Iodid- und/oder Silikatanionen aus Salzlösungen für die Elektrolyse durch Anionenaustausch an Zirkoniumhydroxid | [2006/22] | English: | Method of purification of salt solutions for electrolysis by removing iodine- and/or silicate anions by anion exchange, using zirconium hydroxide as anion exchanger | [2006/22] | French: | Méthode de purication de saumure pour l'électrolyse par enlèvement d'anions d'iodure et de silicates par échange d'anions sur de l'hydroxide de zirconium | [2006/24] |
Former [2000/12] | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Salzlösungen für die Elektrolyse | ||
Former [2000/12] | Method of purification of salt solutions for electrolysis | ||
Former [2000/12] | Methode de purication de saumure pour l'électrolyse | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 31.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0986922 ; | [X]EP0427256 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * page 1, line 41 - line 46 * * page 3, line 32 - line 43 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 4 *; | [X]EP0699628 (CHLORINE ENG CORP LTD) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 21 - line 56 * * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 26 *; | [A]JPH07328432 ; | [A]US5464603 (MARCHIN GEORGE L ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4483754 (SHIROKI HIROYUKI) [A] 1-10 * column 11 - column 47 * * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 16 *; | [DA]EP0659686 (SOLVAY) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09086922 A 19970331 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * | [X] - SAIKI K ET AL, "NEW DESULFACTION SYSTEM FOR CHLOR-ALKALI PLANT", MODERN CHLOR-ALKALI TECHNOLOGY, vol. 6, page 82-88, XP000562462 [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 04, & JP07328432 A 19951219 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |