blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0983885

EP0983885 - Air passage switching system for air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DENSO CORPORATION
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city
Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
For all designated states
SHIMIZU INDUSTRY COMPANY LTD.
1, Chasenbo-shita, Hitotugi-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Denso Corporation
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP
For all designated states
SHIMIZU INDUSTRY COMPANY LTD.
1, Chasenbo-shita, Hitotugi-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Masahiro, Intellectual Property Center
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
02 / Banno, Kousei, Intellectual Property Center
c/o SHIMIZU INDUSTRY CO. LTD., 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-0003 / JP
 [2001/35]
Former [2000/10]01 / Ito, Masahiro, Intellectual Property Center
c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
02 / Banno, Kousei, Intellectual Property Center
c/o SHIMIZU INDUSTRY CO. LTD., 1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz, et al
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Klingseisen, Franz, et al
Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Former [2000/10]Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Application number, filing date99116189.424.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998023902925.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23902998
JP1999020958723.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20958799
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0983885
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0983885
Date:04.04.2001
[2001/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983885
Date:17.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2001
ClassificationIPC:B60H1/00
[2000/10]
CPC:
B60H1/00678 (EP,US); B60H2001/00714 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2002/01]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Luftsteuervorrichtung für Klimaanlage[2001/36]
English:Air passage switching system for air conditioner[2000/10]
French:Système de distribution d'air pour un dispositif de climatisation[2000/10]
Former [2000/10]Luftsteurvorrichtung für Klimaanlage
Examination procedure10.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/27]
13.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.03.2002Fee for grant paid
22.03.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2550848  (VALEO [FR]);
 [A]FR2669277  (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1,7 * page 3, line 27 - page 6, line 11; figure 4 *;
 [A]EP0598942  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]FR2699636  (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]);
 [A]DE19717335  (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] * abstract *;
 [PA]EP0925969  (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [PA] * paragraphs [0010] - [0016]; figures 1-4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.