EP0959458 - Disk device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Takeshi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Enomoto, Kenji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/47] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/47] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116231.4 | 16.12.1993 | [1999/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0959458 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0959458 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/54 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
G11B5/54 (EP);
G11B11/10558 (EP);
G11B11/1058 (EP);
G11B21/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/32] |
Former [1999/47] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenlaufwerk | [1999/47] | English: | Disk device | [1999/47] | French: | Unité de disques | [1999/47] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93120322.8 / EP0658882 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0264775 (IBM) [A] 1,2 * page 4, column 5, line 29 - page 6, column 9, line 35; figure FIGURES *; | [A]WO9211630 (INTEGRAL PERIPHERALS INC) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 28 - page 21, line 30; figure FIGURES *; | [A]GB2237920 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1,2 * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line 20; figure FIGURES *; | [A]EP0089277 (CII HONEYWELL BULL) [A] 1,2 * page 6, line 26 - page 14, line 28; figure FIGURES *; | [A]JPH02210677 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901107), vol. 014, no. 508, Database accession no. (P - 1128), & JP02210677 A 19900822 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |