blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0982311

EP0982311 - Imidosilane compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/29]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
CROMPTON CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
CK WITCO CORPORATION
One American Lane
Greenwich Connecticut 06831-2559 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gunther, Michael L.
24 Richter Drive, Danbury
Connecticut 06811 / US
02 / Pohl, Eric R.
2501 Canterbury Way, Mt. Kisco
New York 10549 / US
03 / Petty, Herbert E.
7 Winthrop Road, Bethel
Connecticut 06801 / US
 [2005/42]
Former [2000/09]01 / Gunther, Michael L.
24 Richter Drive Danbury
Connecticut 06811 / US
02 / Pohl, Eric R.
2501 Canterbury Way Mt. Kisco
New York 10549 / US
03 / Petty, Herbert E.
7 Winthrop Road Bethel
Connecticut 06801 / US
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/09]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99116431.020.08.1999
[2000/09]
Priority number, dateUS1998014047326.08.1998         Original published format: US 140473
[2000/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0982311
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0982311
Date:12.12.2001
[2001/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982311
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2001
ClassificationIPC:C07F7/10, C08K9/06, C07F7/18, C08K5/544, C03C25/40
[2001/50]
CPC:
C07F7/1804 (EP,US); C07F7/10 (KR); C08K5/5477 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/09]C07F7/10, C08K9/06
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/36]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Imidosilan-Zusammensetzungen[2000/09]
English:Imidosilane compositions[2000/09]
French:Compositions d' imidosilanes[2000/09]
Examination procedure08.02.2002Examination requested  [2002/16]
30.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2005Fee for grant paid
02.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04005917.2  / EP1439182
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Request for further processing for:11.03.2004Request for further processing filed
11.03.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.03.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
18.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US3755354  (HOLUB F, et al) [AD] 1,6-8,10 * example - *;
 [A]EP0508610  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,6,10 * example 42; claims 1,11,12 *;
 [X]US4301075  (LOHMANN DIETER, et al) [X] 1,7,10 * column 1 * * column 7, line 58 - line 63 * * column 13 - column 14; examples USE1,USE2 *;
 [X]JPS6429385
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890517), vol. 013, no. 211, Database accession no. (C - 597), & JP01029385 A 19890131 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1,7,10 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.