EP1078805 - Control of vehicle driveline during vehicle start and drive-off [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graf, Fiedrich Charles Lindberghstrasse 2 93049 Regensberg / DE | [2001/09] | Application number, filing date | 99116567.1 | 24.08.1999 | [2001/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1078805 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1078805 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/28, // F16D48/08 , F16D13:00, F16D111:00, F16H59:14 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/188 (KR);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/18 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP);
B60W30/18063 (EP);
B60W40/09 (EP,KR,US);
F16D48/06 (EP,US);
F16D48/068 (EP,US);
F16D48/08 (EP,US);
F16H61/66 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0057 (EP,US);
B60W2530/00 (EP,US);
B60W2540/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2710/0666 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2710/105 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10481 (EP,US);
F16D2500/30406 (EP,US);
F16D2500/30425 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3124 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3144 (EP,US);
F16D2500/31486 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7027 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7041 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70416 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7044 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70454 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70462 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70488 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/32] |
Former [2001/47] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2001/46] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung für den Antriebsstrang beim Anfahren eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2001/09] | English: | Control of vehicle driveline during vehicle start and drive-off | [2001/09] | French: | Système de commande pour une ligne de transmission pendant la mise-en-route d'un véhicule | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 29.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.10.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.10.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3831449 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10 * column 7, line 21 - line 34 * * column 7, line 64 - column 8, line 3; claims 1,3,11,12 * [Y] 4,7; | [Y]EP0638742 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 4,7 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3334711 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19637210 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 * | by applicant | DE19727044 | DE4434111 | DE19726214 | DE19616960 | DE19648055 | - F.GRAF, H.WEIL, advanced transmission with fuzzy logic, 3rd international conference, technical papers, BOLOGNA, (19950329), page 379-389 | - R.FISCHER, R.BERGER (LUK), automatisierung von schaltgetrieben, bericht der vdi-tagung "Getriebe und fahrzeuge, (19980319), page 95FF |