EP0982146 - Printing system and recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/09] | Printer, recording medium for storing print control programs, and printing method | ||
[2005/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Toshihiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Matsuzawa, Yoshihiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
Hayashi, Toshihiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | ||
02 /
Matzuzawa, Yoshihiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 99116619.0 | 25.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | JP19980242351 | 27.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24235198 | JP19980305882 | 27.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30588298 | JP19990198990 | 13.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19899099 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982146 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982146 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | [2002/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982146 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/12, B41J2/045 | [2002/13] | CPC: |
B41J2/04508 (EP,US);
B41J11/20 (EP,US);
B41J13/12 (EP,US);
B41J2/04573 (EP,US);
B41J2/04581 (EP,US);
B41J2/2128 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | B41J13/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | Druckersystem und Druckerspeicher | [2005/46] | English: | Printing system and recording medium | [2005/46] | French: | Système d' impression et mémoire de système d' impression | [2005/46] |
Former [2000/09] | Drucker, Speichermedium für das Drucksteuerprogramm und Druckverfahren | ||
Former [2000/09] | Printer, recording medium for storing print control programs, and printing method | ||
Former [2000/09] | Imprimante, medium de stockage pour des programmes de commande d'impression et méthode d'impression | Examination procedure | 11.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04016811.4 / EP1475235 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2006 | BE | 03.05.2006 | CH | 03.05.2006 | CY | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | LI | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | DK | 03.08.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | GR | 04.08.2006 | ES | 14.08.2006 | IE | 25.08.2006 | LU | 25.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 03.10.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.08.2006 | ||
LU | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
GR | 04.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
BE | 03.05.2006 | ||
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
DK | 03.08.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
PT | 03.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 03.08.2006 | |
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH04151252 ; | [A]JPS6018377 ; | [XAY]US4847638 (MORIYAMA JIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,22 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - line 53 * * column 2, line 48 - line 66 * * column 3, line 38 - line 57 * * column 4, line 3 - line 12 * [A] 4,7,17,20,24 [Y] 5,23; | [A]EP0631257 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 3,9,12 * figures 60A,60B ** column 48, line 36 - column 49, line 33 *; | [PX]JPH1148468 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PX] 1,2,22 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0014] * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920911), vol. 016, no. 438, Database accession no. (M - 1309), & JP04151252 A 19920525 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 16 * abstract * [A] 14,15,25 [Y] 5,23 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850614), vol. 009, no. 139, Database accession no. (M - 387), & JP60018377 A 19850130 (OKI DENKI KOGYO KK) [A] 11,12 * abstract * |