EP0985631 - Multifunctional handlingsystem for bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2001 [2001/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto, Andreas Hannoversche Strasse 10 30989 Gehrden / DE | [2000/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Haverbecker Strasse 21 31787 Hameln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Haverbecker Strasse 21 31787 Hameln / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116646.3 | 26.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998141364 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841364 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985631 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/22, B65G7/08 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
B66F7/22 (EP);
B65G7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/48] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Multifunktionales Korpus-Handlingsystem | [2000/11] | English: | Multifunctional handlingsystem for bodies | [2000/11] | French: | Système de manipulation multifonctionnel de corps | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/30] | 29.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]AU626379B (P.B.C. DEMOLITION & HIRE PTY) [X] 1,8,12 * the whole document * [A] 2,7,10,14,15,20 [Y] 13,19; | [Y]US3753505 (OUSKA) [Y] 13,19 * column A; figures 1-19 *; | [XA]US2411263 (GUERIN) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column W * [A] 15,20; | [A]WO8900146 (WALLMAN) [A] 17 * abstract *; | [A]WO9416982 (ECOND' OR SWEDEN) |