blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0984420

EP0984420 - Device for the presentation of objects, in particular photos or similar [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deja GmbH
Beethovenstrasse 4
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2000/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Deja-Borchard, Monika
Beethovenstrasse 4
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[2000/22]
Former [2000/10]01 / Deja-Borchert, Monika
Beethovenstrasse 4
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Representative(s)Langmaack, Jürgen, et al
Patentanwälte
Maxton & Langmaack
Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Langmaack, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Maxton . Maxton . Langmaack Postfach 51 08 06
50944 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date99116648.926.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateDE1998215842U03.09.1998         Original published format: DE 29815842 U
[2000/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984420
Date:08.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984420
Date:21.03.2001
[2001/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.2001
ClassificationIPC:G09F19/00, G09F1/12, A47G1/06
[2001/12]
CPC:
G09F1/10 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/10]G09F19/00, G09F1/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:Einrichtung zur Präsentation von Gegenständen, insbesondere von Fotos, Objekten oder dergl.[2000/10]
English:Device for the presentation of objects, in particular photos or similar[2000/10]
French:Dispositif pour la présentation d'objets, en particulier photos ou semblables[2000/10]
Examination procedure16.08.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2001Examination requested  [2001/42]
04.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
04.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE29501171U  (HOGG NORBERT) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3813799  (J.CARAVELLO) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 10; figures 12-14 *;
 [PX]WO9855982  (FRY NECOLYA G) [PX] 1-8 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2206281  (J.GOELLER);
 [A]EP0266710  (KOK SCHRAM DE JONG MARIJKE IRE);
 [A]US5077921  (P.MOONEY)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.