blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985366

EP0985366 - Cantilever table [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Antiga, Idolino
Via Antiga 20
31020 San Pietro di Feletto (TV) / IT
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido, et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date99116808.901.09.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateIT1998TV0012109.09.1998         Original published format: IT TV980121
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0985366
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0985366
Date:05.09.2001
[2001/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:A47B17/03, A47B5/02, A47B37/04
[2001/36]
CPC:
A47B5/02 (EP); A47B37/04 (EP)
Former IPC [2000/11]A47B17/03
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/21]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Freitragende Tischplatte[2000/11]
English:Cantilever table[2000/11]
French:Tablette en porte-à-faux[2000/11]
Examination procedure03.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/45]
06.06.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/45]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.04.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
25.04.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
25.04.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4484660  (BAYNUM WALLACE E [US]) [A] 1,10* figures 1-3 *;
 [XA]US4601364  (YORK JAMES A [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-5,9,10;
 [A]US4625833  (LEWIS KENNETH D [US]) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US4730700  (MILLER STANLEY A [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-3 *
by applicantIT1998TV00121
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.