EP0989337 - Independent latch actuator for locking device of a control lever [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Stgt. Zuffenhausen, Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Stgt. Zuffenhausen, Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sander, Edmund Untere Burghalde 47 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Hartnigk, Sven In Buderecker 10 71686 Remseck/N. / DE | 03 /
Hoebel, Peter Wiesenstrasse 5 75242 Neuhausen / DE | [2000/13] | Application number, filing date | 99116910.3 | 27.08.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998144277 | 26.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19844277 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989337 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989337 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989337 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/02, // F16H61:22 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
F16H61/22 (EP,US);
F16H59/02 (EP,KR,US);
F16H2059/0282 (EP,US);
F16H2059/048 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20696 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | Entkoppeltes Betätigungselement für eine Sperreinrichtung eines Wählhebels | [2000/13] | English: | Independent latch actuator for locking device of a control lever | [2000/13] | French: | Elément d'actionnement indépendant pour verrouillage de levier de manoeuvre | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 09.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Request for further processing for: | 23.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 23.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.09.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.04.2005 | IE | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | GR | 27.07.2005 | AT | 27.08.2005 | CY | 27.08.2005 | BE | 31.08.2005 | CH | 31.08.2005 | LI | 31.08.2005 | LU | 31.08.2005 | MC | 31.08.2005 | PT | 10.10.2005 | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/18] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
AT | 27.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
LU | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
AT | 27.08.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.08.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.08.2005 | ||
LI | 31.08.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.08.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
IE | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
GR | 27.07.2005 | ||
PT | 10.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 27.04.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 27.04.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06331009 ; | [A]JPH08159249 ; | [DA]WO9513933 (SCANDMEC AB [SE], et al) [DA] 1* abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06331009 A 19941129 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08159249 A 19960621 (MITSUBISHI AUTOMOB ENG CO LTD;MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9513933 |