EP0984245 - Method of and apparatus for inspecting surface irregularities of transparent plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states Central Glass Company, Limited 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 755-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okugawa, Shinya, c/o Central Glass Company, Limited 1510, Oguchi-cho Matsusaka-shi, Mie 515-0001 / JP | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/10] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99116949.1 | 27.08.1999 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | JP19980246231 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24623198 | JP19990191167 | 06.07.1999 Original published format: JP 19116799 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984245 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984245 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/30, G01N21/958, G01N21/88 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/958 (EP,US);
G01B11/30 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/896 (EP,US);
G01N2021/9586 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | G01B11/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/39] |
Former [2000/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Apparat zur Inspektion von Oberflächenunregelmässigkeiten einer durchsichtigen Platte | [2000/10] | English: | Method of and apparatus for inspecting surface irregularities of transparent plate | [2000/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil d' inspection des irrégularités de la surface d' une plaque transparente | [2000/10] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 11.07.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/05] | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.08.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5413941 (KOOS DANIEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - line 22 * * column 6, line 32 - line 51 * [A] 6 [Y] 4,7,11; | [Y]US5521692 (BARES JAN [US]) [Y] 4,7,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5016099 (BONGARDT WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,8-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - line 45 *; | [A]EP0575095 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [A] 1,5,8-10 * abstract * * column 3 * |