EP0985568 - Sun-visor for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karg, Horst Altmarkring 16 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
Hayn, Hans-Joachim Tannenweg 15 38448 Wolfsburg / DE | [2000/11] | Application number, filing date | 99117001.0 | 28.08.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | DE1998141848 | 12.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19841848 | [2000/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985568 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0985568 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02, B60R7/05 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
B60J3/0282 (EP);
B60J3/0278 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/11] | B60J3/02 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/21] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sonnenblende für Fahrzeuge | [2000/11] | English: | Sun-visor for vehicles | [2000/11] | French: | Pare-soleil pour voitures | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | 08.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.05.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.05.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0622272 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]) [DY] 1-5,8,10 * page 2, column 1, line 17 - page 2, column 1, line 30 * * page 2, column 2, line 33 - page 3, column 3, line 18 * * figures 3,4; claims 1,5 *; | [Y]WO9111340 (AUTOPART SWEDEN AB [SE]) [Y] 1-5,8,10 * page 2, line 16 - page 2, line 35 * * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 10 * * abstract *; | [DA]EP0036448 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR) [DA] 1,6 * page 2, column 2, line 47 - page 2, column 2, line 62 * * page 3, column 4, line 32 - page 3, column 4, line 46 * * figure 2; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE19650923 | US5022599 | US4275916 | EP0609558 | EP0036448 | EP0622272 |