EP1003147 - Guiding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWI Heinrich Wilke GmbH Prof.-Bier-Strasse 1-5 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states HEWI HEINRICH WILKE GMBH Prof.-Bier-Strasse 1-5 34454 Bad Arolsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaupe, Jürgen Amstelstr. 11 D-34516 Vöhl-Marienhagen / DE | 02 /
Bossdorf, Stefan Sternstr. 14 D-34123 Kassel / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117132.3 | 31.08.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | DE19982020819U | 20.11.1998 Original published format: DE 29820819 U | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003147 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Classification | IPC: | G09F7/00, G09F19/22 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
G09F15/00 (EP);
G09F7/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Führungs- und Leitsystem | [2000/21] | English: | Guiding system | [2000/21] | French: | Système de guidage | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |