blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0984440

EP0984440 - Aberration detection device and optical information recording and reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Saimi, Tetsuo
1-1-401, Takatsukacho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0035 / JP
02 / Tanaka, Shin-ichi
42-14, Yamatehigashi 1- chome
Kyoutanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0357 / JP
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Stippl, Hubert, et al
Patentanwälte
Freiligrathstrasse 7a
90482 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/09]Stippl, Hubert, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Freiligrathstrasse 7a
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/10]Hafner, Dieter, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Phys.
Dr. Hafner & Stippl, Patentanwälte, Ostendstrasse 132
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99117168.701.09.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998025075004.09.1998         Original published format: JP 25075098
JP1998026462518.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26462598
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984440
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984440
Date:24.05.2000
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2000
ClassificationIPC:G11B7/125, G11B7/13
[2000/10]
CPC:
G11B7/1353 (EP,US); G11B7/131 (EP,US); G11B7/1369 (EP,US);
G11B7/1378 (EP,US); G11B7/13927 (EP,US); G11B2007/0013 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/06]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Aberrationsdetektion und Gerät zur Aufnahme und Wiedergabe von optischer Information[2000/10]
English:Aberration detection device and optical information recording and reproducing apparatus[2000/10]
French:Système de détection d'aberration et appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'information optique[2000/10]
Examination procedure17.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
25.11.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
21.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
13.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/17]
09.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2010/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
18.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
07.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
16.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.01.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.01.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PA]JPH10289470  ;
 [A]US5120128  (ULICH BOBBY L [US], et al);
 [X]EP0517491  (IBM [US]);
 [X]EP0545713  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]);
 [X]US5416757  (LUECKE FRANK [US], et al);
 [X]EP0762403  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [X]EP0765015  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 JPH09138343  [ ] (MARK KK);
 [X]EP0807928  (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]);
 [A]EP0844606  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [X]US5793735  (OONO MASAHIRO [JP]);
 [PX]US5818643  (FUJIOKA YOSHISATO [JP])
ExaminationEP0953974
by applicantJPH05282705
 JPH0777031
 JPH08212611
 JPH09212917
 EP0844606
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.