blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0984303

EP0984303 - Production process of color filter, liquid crystal display device using the color filter produced by the production process, and ink-jet head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akahira, Makoto
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Wada, Satoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Yamaguchi, Hiromitsu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Ohgushi, Takuhiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/23]
Former [2000/10]01 / Akahira, Makoto
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Wada, Satoshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Yamaguchi, Hiromitsu
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Ohgushi, Takahiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Weser, Wolfgang, et al
Weser & Kollegen
Patentanwälte
Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/14]Weser, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Former [2000/10]Weser, Wolfgang
Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43
81245 München / DE
Application number, filing date99117250.302.09.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998024791902.09.1998         Original published format: JP 24791998
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984303
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication
No.:EP0984303
Date:14.06.2000
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984303
Date:02.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1999
ClassificationIPC:G02B5/20, G02F1/1335, B41J2/21, B41J2/505
[2000/10]
CPC:
G02F1/133516 (EP,US); B41J2/2132 (EP,US); G02B5/201 (EP,US);
B41J2202/09 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/47]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für einen Farbfilter, damit ausgestattete Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung, und Tintenstrahlkopf[2000/10]
English:Production process of color filter, liquid crystal display device using the color filter produced by the production process, and ink-jet head[2000/10]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un filtre coloré, panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides l'utilisant et tête à jet d'encre[2000/10]
Examination procedure07.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/45]
19.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2003Fee for grant paid
07.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4272771  (FURUKAWA TATSUYA) [A] 1* column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 19 *;
 [Y]EP0517521  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * page 18, line 28 - page 19, line 26; figures 40,41 *;
 [Y]EP0517543  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-6,8-10 * column 1, line 37 - line 56 * * column 7, line 45 - column 10, line 15 *;
 [Y]EP0660159  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 7 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0675385  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 7, line 8 - page 9, line 11 * * page 11, line 15 - line 38 *;
 [X]EP0790509  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 9 * column 12, line 1 - line 33; figure 13 * * column 14, line 18 - line 28 *;
 [X]EP0832752  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 9 * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 46 * * column 13, line 24 - line 53 * * column 26, line 19 - line 20 * * column 27, line 6 - line 9 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08292310 A 19961105 (CANON INC) [Y] 1-10 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10142417 A 19980529 (CANON INC) [A] 7 * abstract *
by applicantJPS5975205
 JPS63235901
 JPH01217302
 JPH04123005
 JPH09138306
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.