Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000094854 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27167798 | 25.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000089476 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25473298 | 09.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0985546 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP25473298 | 09.09.1998 | JP27167798 | 25.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6294318 | 25.09.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP25473298 | 09.09.1998 | JP27167798 | 25.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6312873 | 06.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP25473298 | 09.09.1998 | JP27167798 | 25.09.1998 |