blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0987124

EP0987124 - Heat-sensitive stencil sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Riso Kagaku Corporation
2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]For all designated states
RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION
2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION
2-20-15, Shimbashi, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kinoshita, Hideyuki, c/o Riso Kagaku Corp. R & D
Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-0333 / JP
02 / Watanabe, Hiroshi, c/o Riso Kagaku Corp. R & D
Center, 1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda, Amimachi
Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken, 300-0333 / JP
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte
Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99117711.408.09.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateJP1998026007614.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26007698
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0987124
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987124
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:B41N1/24
[2000/12]
CPC:
B41N1/24 (EP,US); Y10S428/913 (EP,US); Y10T428/249987 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/49]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wärmeempfindliches Schablonenblatt[2000/12]
English:Heat-sensitive stencil sheet[2000/12]
French:Feuille stencil sensible à la chaleur[2000/12]
Examination procedure05.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/12]
22.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
31.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.04.2004Fee for grant paid
07.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPH0867080  ;
 [AD]JPS5916793  ;
 [PA]JPH10324074
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960731), vol. 1996, no. 07, & JP08067080 A 19960312 (TORAY IND INC) [AD] 1 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840516), vol. 008, no. 104, Database accession no. (M - 296), & JP59016793 A 19840127 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [AD] 1 * abstract *
 [PA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10324074 A 19981208 (TORAY IND INC) [PA] 1 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0985545
 EP0985544
 EP0983868
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.