blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0985341

EP0985341 - Clumpable animal litter containing welan gum [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MARCAL PAPER MILLS, INC.
One Market Street
Elmwood Park, NJ 07407 / US
[2000/11]
Inventor(s)01 / Knapick, Edward G.
27 Glenbrook Road
Ogdensburg, New Jersey 07439 / US
02 / Willemsen, Brent
1017 Harding Street
Westfield, New Jersey 07090 / US
03 / Wolfer, Ernest P.
36 Montrose Terrace
Allendale, New Jersey 07401 / US
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99117729.608.09.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateUS1998015072810.09.1998         Original published format: US 150728
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0985341
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
ClassificationIPC:A01K1/015
[2000/11]
CPC:
A01K1/0154 (EP); A01K1/0155 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/11]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Klumpender Tierstreu mit Welangummi[2000/11]
English:Clumpable animal litter containing welan gum[2000/11]
French:Litière pour animaux capable de former des agglomérats, contenant de la gomme de wélane[2000/11]
Examination procedure03.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/42]
15.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inby applicantUS5503111
 US5609123
 US5359961
 US5241291
 US5728270
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.