EP0990711 - Treatment of surfaces before thermally spray coating them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2002/06] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Linde Gas AG Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states Linde Technische Gase GmbH Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Ritter-von-Halt-Strasse 5 82110 Germering / DE | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Kasseckert, Rainer, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Kasseckert, Rainer, et al Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/14] | Obermüller, Bernhard, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117877.3 | 10.09.1999 | [2000/14] | Priority number, date | DE1998144668 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19844668 | [2000/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990711 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990711 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C23C4/02, B24C1/00 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
C23C4/02 (EP);
B24C1/003 (EP);
B24C1/10 (EP);
C23C24/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/14] | Title | German: | Bearbeitung von mittels thermischen Spritzens zu beschichtender Oberflächen | [2000/14] | English: | Treatment of surfaces before thermally spray coating them | [2000/14] | French: | Traitement de surfaces avant leur revêtement par projection thermique | [2000/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.07.2003 | FR | 09.07.2003 | GB | 09.07.2003 | IE | 09.07.2003 | IT | 09.07.2003 | NL | 09.07.2003 | AT | 10.09.2003 | CY | 10.09.2003 | LU | 10.09.2003 | BE | 30.09.2003 | CH | 30.09.2003 | LI | 30.09.2003 | MC | 30.09.2003 | DK | 09.10.2003 | GR | 09.10.2003 | SE | 09.10.2003 | ES | 20.10.2003 | PT | 09.12.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
FR | 09.07.2003 | ||
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
AT | 10.09.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
CH | 30.09.2003 | ||
LI | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
ES | 20.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
AT | 10.09.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
CH | 30.09.2003 | ||
LI | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
ES | 20.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
CH | 30.09.2003 | ||
LI | 30.09.2003 | ||
MC | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
ES | 20.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/52] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
BE | 30.09.2003 | ||
CH | 30.09.2003 | ||
LI | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
ES | 20.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 30.09.2003 | ||
LI | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
ES | 20.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/44] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 30.09.2003 | ||
LI | 30.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
LU | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
CY | 10.09.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
IE | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
DK | 09.10.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
GB | 09.07.2003 | ||
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
SE | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
GR | 09.10.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 09.07.2003 | |
NL | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | NL | 09.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58165962 ; | [A]JPH0250947 ; | [A]EP0316264 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT [DE]); | [A]DE3830132 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4924643 (BUIGUEZ ALEXANDRE [FR], et al); | [A]EP0375914 (URANIT GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]WO9324275 (ICE BLAST INT LTD [BB], et al); | [Y]WO9720961 (BLACK ICE GOLF COMPANY L L C [US]); | [A]DE19636305 (LINDE AG [DE]); | [YA]DE19639437 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AP]WO9858768 (GEVI GMBH [DE], et al) |