EP0989598 - Process for wet etching a semiconductor structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/29] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claussen, Wilhelm, Dr. Dorothea-Erxleben-Strasse 10 01129 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Vogt, Mirko, Dr. Heinrich-Greif-Strasse 25 01217 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Lorenz, Barbara Zum Kiefernhang 6 01109 Dresden / DE | 04 /
Sperlich, Hans-Peter Bergmannstrasse 12 01309 Dresden / DE | 05 /
Penner, Klaus Eschenweg 1 01458 Ottendorf-Okrilla / DE | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117981.3 | 15.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | DE1998144102 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19844102 | [2000/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989598 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989598 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/308, H01L21/311, H01L21/027, H01L21/762, C09K13/06 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/76224 (EP,US);
H01L21/3081 (EP,US);
H01L21/31111 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/13] | H01L21/311, H01L21/033, H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | [2004/50] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Nassätzung einer Halbleiterstruktur | [2000/13] | English: | Process for wet etching a semiconductor structure | [2000/13] | French: | Procédé d'attaque par voie humide d'une structure à semiconducteurs | [2000/13] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/25] | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.10.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.10.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.10.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5112762 (ANDERSON DIRK N [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 16; figures 4A-4C *; | [A]EP0854510 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 1, line 42 - line 55 * * column 3, line 14 - line 58; figures 1A,1B * * column 4, line 13 - line 23; figures 1E,1F * * column 4, line 24 - column 6, line 13; figures 2A-2E *; | [A]JPS6043831 ; | [A]US5300463 (CATHEY DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 13 - line 38 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 19; figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850713), vol. 009, no. 169, Database accession no. (E - 328), & JP60043831 A 19850308 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * |