EP0994262 - Attachment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennemann, Karl-Heinz Hanauer Weg 23 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
Tandler, Peter Krontaler Weg 5 61479 Kronberg/Ts. / DE | 03 /
König, Harald Gartenstrasse 7 61239 Ober-Mörlen / DE | [2000/16] | Application number, filing date | 99118149.6 | 11.09.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | DE1998147323 | 14.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847323 | [2000/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994262 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0994262 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B9/00, F16B5/10, B60T11/26, F16B21/02 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B60T11/26 (EP);
F16B21/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/16] | F16B9/00, F16B5/10, B60T11/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Befestigungsvorrichtung | [2000/16] | English: | Attachment device | [2000/16] | French: | Dispositif de fixation | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/20] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB561395 (FRANK JARRETT) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,13 * page 6, line 62 - page 7, line 37; figures 1-3 * [Y] 10,12; | [X]DE8204505U (RAYMOND A) [X] 1-7,13 * page 4, line 22 - page 6, line 9; figure - *; | [Y]GB2240134 (ZHANG NING) [Y] 10 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US3811157 (SCHENK P) [Y] 12 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE4115063 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4115063 |