EP1001097 - Flush water distributer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KERAMAG Keramische Werke Aktiengesellschaft Kreuzerkamp 11 40878 Ratingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states KERAMAG Keramische Werke Aktiengesellschaft Kreuzerkamp 11 D-40878 Ratingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwarze, Jan Stockweg 57 47804 Krefeld / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118441.7 | 17.09.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE19981051754 | 10.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851754 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001097 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001097 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/03, E03D11/13 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
E03D9/02 (EP);
E03D11/13 (EP);
E03D2201/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | Spülwasserverteiler | [2000/20] | English: | Flush water distributer | [2000/20] | French: | Répartiteur d'eau de rinçage | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 11.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 29.05.2002 | IE | 29.05.2002 | PT | 29.08.2002 | AT | 17.09.2002 | LU | 17.09.2002 | BE | 30.09.2002 | CY | 30.09.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | GR | 29.05.2002 | |
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
PT | 29.08.2002 | ||
AT | 17.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
CY | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 29.05.2002 | |
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
PT | 29.08.2002 | ||
AT | 17.09.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | GR | 29.05.2002 | |
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
PT | 29.08.2002 | ||
BE | 30.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | GR | 29.05.2002 | |
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
PT | 29.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 29.05.2002 | |
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | IE | 29.05.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1658261 (ANNAWERK GMBH) [A] 1 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 4; figures 1-5 *; | [A]BE789895 (DRIESEN FRANCISCUS A J) [A] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 5, line 22 - page 8, line 17; figure - *; | [A]EP0643177 (ABU PLAST KUNSTSTOFF [DE]) [A] 1* abstract * |